Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Cusani

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542Born
14 Dec 158846.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158947.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
14 Jan 159149.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
30 Aug 159553.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Oct 159856.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

MicroData Summary for Agostino Cusani (VIAF: 289539612)
Agostino Cardinal Cusani (born 1542, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast