Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetrij Čupor Moslavački

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1438AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
13 Feb 1447AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
18 Jul 1453AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
14 Jun 1465AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
14 Apr 1466AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1481¹DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Demetrij Čupor Moslavački:
Bishop Demetrij Čupor Moslavački (died 1481) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 251, and Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015