Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomé Cardinal de la Cueva y Toledo

Deceased

Administrator of Manfredonia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1499Born
19 Dec 154445.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 May 154646.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
12 Sep 154849.0AppointedAdministrator of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
10 Mar 154949.5ResignedAdministrator of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
8 Jun 154949.7Ordained BishopBishop
4 Dec 155152.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
29 May 155555.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
13 Sep 156061.0AppointedAdministrator of Manfredonia, Italy
29 Jun 156262.8DiedAdministrator of Manfredonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de la Cueva y Toledo
Bartolomé Cardinal de la Cueva y Toledo (born , died ) Administrator of Manfredonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuéllar, Diocese of Segovia, Spain
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Giacomo degli Spagnoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Family Tomb, San Francisco, Monastery, Cuéllar, Diocese of Segovia, Spain

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
  • a cardinal for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 126, and Page 301
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 61, Number 345
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018