Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Branda Cardinal Castiglione

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Administrator of Veszprém

Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350²BornVarese
16 Aug 140454.6AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
6 Jun 141161.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
6 Jun 141161.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Sep 141262.6AppointedAdministrator of Veszprém, Hungary
29 Jun 142070.4AppointedAdministrator of Lisieux, France
12 Apr 142474.2ResignedAdministrator of Lisieux, France
14 Mar 143181.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 Jan 144090.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
4 Feb 1443³93.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Branda Castiglione:
Branda Cardinal Castiglione (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015