Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Cromer

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1521AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
Apr 1522³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
23 Jul 1539ResignedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
16 Mar 1542DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Cromer
Archbishop George Cromer (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Armagh

  • a bishop for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1522, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jun 2018

Quantcast