Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Isidoro Croce, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Abbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1892Born
11 Nov 192028.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
18 Dec 193745.9AppointedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
196067.9DiedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Croce
Abbot Isidoro Croce O.S.B.I. (born , died 1960) Abbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottaferrata

  • a priest for 39.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast