Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Crispi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lampsacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1781Born
26 May 180826.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 183654.7SelectedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
11 Jul 183654.9ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
10 Sep 185978.1DiedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Crispi
Bishop Giuseppe Crispi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Lampsacus

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalazzo Adriano, Italy

  • a priest for 51.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 230
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast