Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Cardinal de Créqui Canaples

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens

Cardinal-Deacon of San Trifone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1531BornFrance
15 Dec 155322.4AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
22 Apr 155422.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 155422.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
14 Jul 156432.9AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
12 Mar 156533.6Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 156634.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Trifone
20 Jun 157442.9DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Créqui Canaples:
Antoine Cardinal de Créqui Canaples (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
  • a cardinal for 9.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015