Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Eberhard von Cratz von Schraffenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591Born
18 Apr 165463.2SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
26 Jun 166271.4ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
13 Mar 166372.1DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hugo Eberhard von Cratz von Schraffenstein
Bishop Hugo Eberhard von Cratz von Schraffenstein (born 1591, died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEngers

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 373
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018