Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Covarrubias, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos


Events

DateEventTitle
21 May 1280AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
22 Aug 1280Ordained BishopBishop of Burgos, Spain
12 Nov 1299DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Fernando Covarrubias:
Bishop Fernando Covarrubias O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 298, Number 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014