Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Fauni-Pio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹BornCostacciaro
1543²47.0AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
9 Apr 154953.3AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
28 May 154953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
1558²62.0ResignedBishop of Acqui, Italy
1562²66.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Acqui, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Fauni-Pio:
Bishop Bonaventura Fauni-Pio O.F.M. Conv. Bishop Emeritus of Acqui

  • a bishop for 12.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 113
  • ob: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,555
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013