Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henry B. Coskery

Deceased

Priest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1808Born
20 Sep 183426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
29 Jul 185345.0AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
1854¹45.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Portland, Maine, USA
27 Feb 187263.6DiedPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Henry B. Coskery
Father Henry B. Coskery (born , died ) Priest of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHain's Farm, Middleburg

  • a priest for 37.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast