Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Corvo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1322AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
13 Mar 1326AppointedBishop of Quimper, France
31 Aug 1330AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
1341²DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Corvo
Bishop Jacques Corvo O.P. (died 1341) Bishop of Toulon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 537, and Page 211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast