Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Neri Maria Cardinal Corsini

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1685BornFlorence, Italy
14 Aug 173045.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Dec 173045.5Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 173145.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
2 Mar 173347.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
6 May 173751.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
Aug 174055.2AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
6 Dec 177085.5DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Neri Maria Corsini:
Neri Maria Cardinal Corsini (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a cardinal for 40.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Aug 1730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015