Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Corsini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1335¹BornFirenze
18 Mar 136227.2AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
1 Sep 136328.7AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
7 Jun 137035.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
7 Jun 137035.4Elevated to Cardinal
1374²39.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
16 Aug 140570.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Corsini:
Cardinal Pietro Corsini (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a cardinal for 35.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 250, and Page 536
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013