Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leo Cornelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Sylvestrine OSB)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1912BornPittsburg, KS, USA
3 Nov 192917.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Jul 193523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Oct 195947.4AppointedAbbot General of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jan 196653.7ResignedAbbot General of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Oct 200593.5DiedAbbot General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Leo Cornelli:
Priest Leo Cornelli O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

  • a priest for 70.3 years

Source(s):
  • prof/r/d: CB, 29 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013