Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Cornaro

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1720BornVenice, Italy
1 Jun 177857.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 177858.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
27 Feb 177958.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 178968.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cornaro:
Giovanni Cardinal Cornaro (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

  • a priest for 10.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015