Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Contestabile

Deceased

Bishop of Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639¹Born
26 Jul 166122.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 166930.6AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
18 Jul 169960.5DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Contestabile
Bishop Marco Antonio Contestabile (born 1639, died ) Bishop of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStilo

  • a priest for 37.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 125
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast