Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Patrick Maurice Connaughton, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Suixian [Suihsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1889Born
190616.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Mar 191323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Jun 193747.6AppointedPrefect of Suixian [Suihsien], China
Mar 195161.3ResignedPrefect of Suixian [Suihsien], China
19 May 196777.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Suixian [Suihsien], China

MicroData Summary for Patrick Maurice Connaughton
Father Patrick Maurice Connaughton O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Suixian [Suihsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallinasloe, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
Death PlaceCalifornia, USA

  • a priest for 54.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast