Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raniero Concoreggi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Oct 1296AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
19 Nov 1303AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
18 Aug 1321DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raniero Concoreggi
Archbishop Raniero Concoreggi (died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 415, and Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast