Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime de Conchillos, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1505AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
23 Feb 1505AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
25 Feb 1509AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
1 Oct 1512AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
4 Aug 1542DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Conchillos
Bishop Jaime de Conchillos O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Death PlaceTarazona, Diocese of Tarazona

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 22, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209, and Page 159
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast