Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1665Born
17 May 170640.5Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170640.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
6 May 171549.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
24 Jul 173064.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
8 Jul 173973.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Carlo Colonna
Carlo Cardinal Colonna (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 33.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018