Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Collia, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1684Born
24 Mar 170824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
1 Sep 172541.4AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
20 Sep 172541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
23 Dec 172642.7AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
27 Jul 173551.3DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Collia
Bishop Paolo Collia O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaccanopoli

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,839
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237, and Page 290
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast