Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Cockburn

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1507AppointedBishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose), Scotland, Great Britain
27 Apr 1524AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Apr 1526DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Cockburn
Bishop Robert Cockburn (died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189, and Page 287
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast