Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Coccoli

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1709³BornArpino
12 Oct 173223.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 175040.7AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
10 May 175040.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
Feb 1761³51.5DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Coccoli:
Bishop Bartolomeo Coccoli (born , died Feb 1761) Bishop of Montepeloso

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015