Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Clerk

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Mar 1523AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 1523Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
3 Jan 1541DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Clerk
Bishop John Clerk (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,523, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast