Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Innocenzo Cardinal Ciocchi del Monte

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532BornBorgo San Donnino, Italy
30 May 155018.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jun 155018.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Onofrio
4 May 156230.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Callisto
17 Nov 156432.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
3 Dec 156836.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
2 Nov 157745.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Ciocchi del Monte:
Cardinal Innocenzo Ciocchi del Monte (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

  • a cardinal for 27.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013