Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Engelmar Chrel (Krol)

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1399AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
25 Jan 1400Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
21 Dec 1422DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Engelmar Chrel (Krol) (VIAF: 107738053)
Bishop Engelmar Chrel (Krol) (died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 184
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,773
  • ob/c23: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast