Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Chomiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1730³Born
22 Dec 175323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Mar 175423.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 176535.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
5 Aug 176535.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
12 Apr 177646.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
16 Jul 180373.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Chomiński
Bishop Michael Chomiński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoistonnac

  • a priest for 49.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast