Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Robert Chopard-Lallier, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Parakou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1921BornLocle, Switzerland
6 Jan 194523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
4 Jan 195735.8AppointedPrefect of Parakou, Benin
196240.8ResignedPrefect of Parakou, Benin
21 Jul 197352.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Parakou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Robert Chopard-Lallier:
Priest Robert Chopard-Lallier S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Parakou

  • a priest for 28.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013