Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Benedetto Maria Salvatore Chianetta, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1937 Born
3 Nov 195720.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Jul 196123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Mar 199557.3SelectedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
20 May 199557.5ConfirmedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
23 Oct 201072.9ResignedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Maria Salvatore Chianetta
Abbot Benedetto Maria Salvatore Chianetta O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFavara

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2010
  • prof: CB, 29 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast