Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Cheriton

Deceased

Bishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1436AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
25 Nov 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
23 Dec 1447DiedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Cheriton
Bishop Thomas Cheriton (died ) Bishop of Bangor

  • a bishop for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,458
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 102
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast