Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Roland de Chauvigné

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1532Born
6 Apr 155421.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
25 Nov 156331.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
1572²39.6DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roland de Chauvigné (VIAF: 316446769)
Father Roland de Chauvigné (born , died 1572) Former Bishop-Elect of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 27 Oct 2017