Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Charlton

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1327AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
11 Jan 1344DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Charlton:
Bishop Thomas Charlton (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 73
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013