Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal de Challant

Deceased

Administrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹Born
9 May 140454.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
9 May 140454.3Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jun 140454.4AppointedAdministrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
23 Sep 140555.7InstalledAdministrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
19 Mar 141262.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
19 Mar 141262.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 141868.6DiedAdministrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Challant
Antonio Cardinal de Challant (born 1350, died ) Administrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavoy

  • a priest for 6.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 May 1404
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast