Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuliano Cardinal Cesarini (Jr.)

Deceased

Administrator of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1466²Born
20 Sep 149327.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149327.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Sergio e Bacco
14 Feb 150034.1AppointedAdministrator of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
5 Mar 150337.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
29 Nov 150337.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
1 May 151044.3DiedAdministrator of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Cesarini (Jr.)
Giuliano Cardinal Cesarini (Jr.) (born 1466, died ) Administrator of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast