Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierdonato Cardinal Cesi (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583Born
16 Dec 164158.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 164259.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
30 Jan 165673.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Pierdonato Cesi (Jr.)
Pierdonato Cardinal Cesi (Jr.) (born 1583, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 14.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018