Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Cervantes

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1553BornMéxico
28 May 160854.9AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
3 May 160955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
13 Sep 161461.2DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Juan de Cervantes:
Bishop Juan de Cervantes (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,893
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015