Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Cerdà i Lloscos

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1390²BornSanta Margalida
8 Jul 144757.5SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
8 Jan 144858.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
16 Feb 144858.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Feb 144858.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
28 Mar 144959.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lérida, Spain
12 Sep 145969.7DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cerdà i Lloscos:
Cardinal Antonio Cerdà i Lloscos (died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a cardinal for 11.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Feb 1448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013