Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Cerbuna Negro, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1538Born
1564²25.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
9 Sep 158547.5AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
24 Nov 158547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
5 Mar 159759.0DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Cerbuna Negro
Bishop Pedro Cerbuna Negro C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFonz, Diocese of Huesca
Ordained BishopTrinité, Convent, Monzon
Death PlaceCalatayud

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,814
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 97, Number 606
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast