Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baldassare Cardinal Cenci (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710Born
23 Nov 176151.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jan 176252.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
2 Mar 176353.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Cenci (Jr.) (VIAF: 89087985)
Baldassare Cardinal Cenci (Jr.) (born 1710, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast