Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Elia Celebian

Deceased

Bishop of the Tribunal of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1848BornDiarbekir
21 Apr 187223.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 189950.4AppointedBishop of the Tribunal of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian)
14 May 189950.7Ordained BishopBishop of the Tribunal of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian)
Aug 1915²66.9DiedBishop of the Tribunal of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Elia Celebian:
Bishop Andrea Elia Celebian (born ) Bishop of Diarbekir (Amida)

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013