Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Cecchini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589Born
14 Nov 164455.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 Mar 164556.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 164556.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Sisto
1 May 165667.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Sisto

MicroData Summary for Domenico Cecchini
Domenico Cardinal Cecchini (born 1589, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Sisto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast