Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Cavalieri (Caballero)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565Born
19 Jan 162661.0Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 162661.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
28 Jan 162964.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cavalieri (Caballero)
Giacomo Cardinal Cavalieri (Caballero) (born 1565, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast