Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nilo Catalani, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637¹BornCastania
24 Dec 169255.9AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
4 Jan 169356.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
3 Jun 169457.4DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nilo Catalani:
Archbishop Nilo Catalani O.S.B.M. (born 1637, died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 190
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,855
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015