Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Anselmo Mary Catalán, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of New Norcia, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1878Born
24 Mar 189516.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 190223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Oct 191435.9AppointedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
30 Jun 191536.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Drisdale River, Australia
195172.1ResignedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
195172.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Drisdale River, Australia
29 Jul 195980.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of New Norcia, Australia

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Mary Catalán
Abbot Anselmo Mary Catalán O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of New Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorella de Navarra, Spain

  • a priest for 56.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast