Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Castellar y de Borja

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1441BornValencia
23 Aug 149351.7AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
31 May 150361.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150361.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
9 Aug 150361.7AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
1 Jan 150563.1DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Castellar y de Borja:
Cardinal Juan Castellar y de Borja (died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a cardinal for 1.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013