Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Lorenzo Castiglioni

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1662AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
9 Dec 1680AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
5 Aug 1682DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Lorenzo Castiglioni:
Bishop Gian Lorenzo Castiglioni (died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015