Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adriano Cardinal di Castello (Castellesi)

Deceased

Former Administrator of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1458¹Born
14 Feb 150244.1AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
May 150244.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
31 May 150345.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150345.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
2 Aug 150446.5AppointedAdministrator of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
5 Jul 151860.5ResignedAdministrator of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
5 Jul 151860.5ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
Dec 1521²63.9DiedFormer Administrator of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Adriano di Castello (Castellesi) (VIAF: 22293686)
Adriano Cardinal di Castello (Castellesi) (born 1458, died Dec 1521) Former Administrator of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorneto
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 143, and Page 466
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1502, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast