Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Castellari

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1525AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
15 Nov 1529ResignedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
6 Mar 1531AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
25 Jun 1531Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
17 Aug 1540AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
1542²ResignedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
27 Jun 1546DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Castellari
Bishop Bernardino Castellari (died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 280, and Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1531, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast